+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed 05/01/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Townley
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Phillips
- Coauthored by Representative Roe
- Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy)
- Coauthored by Representative McBride
- Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Dills
- Coauthored by Representative Bell
- Coauthored by Representative Burns
- Coauthored by Representative Fugate
- Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey)
- Coauthored by Representative Ranson
- Coauthored by Representative Munson
- Referred for enrollment
- Coauthored by Representative McDugle
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Referred for engrossment
- Title restored
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on General Order
- Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator McCortney
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
March 5, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor