+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill
- General Order
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1
- Emergency clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 9
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor