+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Sears (principal House author)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Mazzei; authored by Finance Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Mazzei
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor