+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- To Senate
- Motion expired
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 9
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Shelton
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2
- CCR adopted
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Stiles
- CCR read
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCs named Marlatt, Griffin, Schulz, Bingman, Sparks, Burrage
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
- Amended
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1
- Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Osborn (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Marlatt
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 22, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 14
May 20, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6
April 16, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 13
March 26, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
March 6, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 8