+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 23, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 10
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14
March 5, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2