+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Tourism
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leewright
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 7, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6