+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 15
- Coauthored by Simpson
- General Order, Considered
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health and Human Services
- Withdrawn from Finance committee
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 7
March 6, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 7