+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Smalley
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor