+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
- HAs adopted
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 2
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer
- General Order
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee sub-committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Watson (principal House author)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Select Agencies sub-committee
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Select Agencies
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator David
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 23, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 17