+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- HC's named, naming same conferees: Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Johnson (Rob); authored by Senator Allen
- Further conference granted, GCCA
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- CCR rejected, further conference requested, conferees to be named later
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 10
- CCR adopted, GCCA
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cleveland
- SCs removed Brinkley, Burrage, Johnson (Rob), Jolley, Justice, Sparks
- CCR read, GCCA
- Title restored
- SCs named GCCA
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCs named Johnson (Rob), Jolley, Justice, Brinkley, Burrage, Sparks
- Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCs named GCCA
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
- Title stricken
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 15
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1
- Referred for engrossment
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Jackson (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 9
April 22, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 7
April 3, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
March 6, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9