+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Park (principal House author)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sykes
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 21, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor