+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- To Senate
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 16
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Patzkowsky, Roberts (Sean)
- CCR adopted
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
- CCR adopted
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- CCR read
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming GCCA
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- SCs named Daniels, McCortney, Rosino, Simpson, Dossett (J.A.), Hicks
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Dills, Gann, Smith
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
- House Rule suspended
- Amended by floor substitute
- Amended
- Enacting clause stricken
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 19
- Referred for engrossment
- Title stricken
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett
- CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9
- General Order, Considered
- Referred for engrossment
- Coauthored by Senator Taylor
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator David
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Stephens
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove as coauthor Senator Boren
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bullard
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Boren
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Daniels
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2021: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 19
April 21, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 6
April 7, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor