+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Hicks
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
February 20, 2019: Senate Advance
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2