+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Wildlife
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Murdock
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
April 8, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor