+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Laid over
- Title restored
- Amended by floor substitute
- General Order
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Remove Representative Newton as principal House author and substitute with Representative Dempsey
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Murdock
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 30, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor