+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/12/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- General Order
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Banz (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Ivester
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 10
March 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
March 11, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor