+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/03/2013
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 8
- Amended
- General Order
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Energy and Aerospace Committee
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Energy and Aerospace
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Jackson (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government
- Withdrawn from Rules committee
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Marlatt
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (4)
April 24, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
April 16, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 8
April 2, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
March 14, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor