+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- CCR adopted
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- CCR adopted
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
- To Senate
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, to House
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- CCR read
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Rule suspended
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCs named Sykes, Schulz, Bingman, Marlatt, Fields, Bass, Floyd
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary and Civil Procedure
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 24
- Amended
- General Order
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Title stricken
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sykes
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2015: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Absent: 19
April 22, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor