+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative O'Donnell (principal House author)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
March 21, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor