+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Mulready (principal House author)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator David
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor