+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
- HAs adopted
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6
- Amended
- General Order
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leewright
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 4
April 22, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 8
April 2, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
February 27, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3