+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6
- General Order
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
- General Order, Considered
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Jech
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 20, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 9
April 6, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 10, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1