+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 27
- General Order, Amended
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Dunnington (principal House author)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bass
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor