+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency restored
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
- Title stricken
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- Emergency clause stricken
- Referred for engrossment
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Smalley
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor