+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
- General Order
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
- General Order, Considered
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
- Emergency removed
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leewright
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 18, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 7
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14
March 14, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2