+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/07/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Perryman
- General Order
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Wright (principal House author)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Schulz
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 31, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 14