+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 101 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims
- General Order
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck, Bush, West (Josh), Hilbert, Echols, McBride, West (Tammy), Newton
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Dahm
- Referred for engrossment
- General Order, Considered
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Floyd
- Remove as author Senator Floyd; authored by Senator Pemberton
- Coauthored by Senator Murdock
- Coauthored by Senator Leewright
- Coauthored by Senator Sharp
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator David
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Floyd
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 101
April 2, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
February 25, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor