+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Simpson
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Hicks
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
April 7, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor