+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 11
- General Order
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leewright
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 7
March 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 7
February 20, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1