+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/02/2022
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 13, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 27
April 4, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
March 14, 2022: Senate And Development Incentives Act. Effective Date.
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor