+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4
- General Order
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Title restored
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leewright
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 23, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 11
March 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 27
March 12, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4