+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 5
- General Order
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author)
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 11
April 7, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
March 2, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor