+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
- Emergency clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Casey (principal House author)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Mazzei
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Ford
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor