+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget
- Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Common Education
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Title restored
- Emergency clause restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Fincher (principal House author)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 14, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3