+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Wallace
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Leewright
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Murdock
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor