+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2
- General Order
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Mulready (principal House author)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Insurance
- Withdrawn from Rules committee
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Brown; authored by Senator Brinkley
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Brown
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6
April 4, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
March 7, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor