+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Standridge
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor