+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Emergency clause restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator David
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
April 24, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 9
April 17, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 26
April 10, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
March 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor