+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCs named Dahm, Barrington, Holt, Brooks, Schulz, Floyd, Matthews
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Kern
- HAs read
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Walker
- General Order
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remove as coauthor Senator Barrington
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Barrington
- Remove as author Senator Barrington; authored by Dahm
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Barrington
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 6, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9