+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- To Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 1
- CCR adopted
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- CCR read
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCs named Griffin, Sykes, Shumate, McAffrey, Brooks, Shaw
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2
- General Order
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Ivester
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Nelson (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Griffin
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 24, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 31
May 23, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 9
April 23, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 8
April 9, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
March 12, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5