+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 4
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Sherrer (principal House author)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bass
- First Reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor