+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in conference
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCs named GCCA
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
- Enacting clause stricken
- Amended
- General Order
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Ritze (principal House author)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Brecheen
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
April 18, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 3
April 4, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
March 21, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor