+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Coauthored by Sparks
- Referred for enrollment
- Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 8
- Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 8
- HAs adopted
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 12
- General Order
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Emergency added
- Title restored
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland, Echols, Osborn
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee sub-committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
- Emergency clause stricken
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Allen, Simpson
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author)
- Coauthored by Pittman
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor