+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- To Senate
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 28
- 2 CCR adopted
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2 CCR adopted
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- 2 CCR submitted
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- 2 CCR read
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- SCs named Shaw, Treat, Fry, Jech, Thompson, Floyd, Matthews
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conferees unable to agree
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCs named Shaw, Fry, Treat, Thompson, Jech, Floyd, Matthews
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Motion expired
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Loring
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 17
- Motion to suspend rule failed
- General Order
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
- Coauthored by Senator Pittman
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Loring (principal House author)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Treat; authored by Senator Shaw
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2018: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 9
April 24, 2017: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 48
- Absent: 7
April 24, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 10
April 12, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
March 21, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor