+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- To Senate
- Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 29
- CCR adopted
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- CCR adopted, GCCA
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- CCR read, GCCA
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming GCCA
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCs named GCCA
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 62 Nays: 18
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 26
- Referred for engrossment
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ortega
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 48
- Amended
- General Order
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Title restored
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Mazzei
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Ortega (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Schulz
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (9)
May 23, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 21
May 22, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 12
April 25, 2013: House Reconsider Measure
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 21
April 25, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 18
April 24, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 48
- Absent: 8
April 10, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 9
April 3, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 12
March 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
March 12, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor