+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan
- General Order
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pugh
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 14
April 6, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor