+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cox (principal House author)
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor