+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCs named Crain, Bingman, Schulz, Marlatt, Burrage, Sparks
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2
- General Order
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cox (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Crain
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator David
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 15, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 9
March 28, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 5
March 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
March 5, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4