+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/24/2015
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Motion expired
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Watson
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 35; Ayes: 28 Nays: 46
- General Order
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee sub-committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5
- General Order, Considered
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Watson (principal House author)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Fields
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 14, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 35
- Absent: 13
April 14, 2015: House Emergency
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 46
- Absent: 26
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor