+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
- General Order, Considered
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Kirt
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Murdock
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 8, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor